Person ? Ch. Frey
- From 1940-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Vice-Président of ELECTRICITE DE STRASBOURG
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of ELECTRICITE DE STRASBOURG
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Vice-Président of ELECTRICITE DE STRASBOURG