Person ? R. Saint
- From 1940-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Vice-Président of SOCIETE CENTRALE DES USINES A PAPIER " CENPA"
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE CENTRALE DES USINES A PAPIER " CENPA"
- From 1945-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of PAPETERIES DE ROQUEFORT