Person ? H. Boisgontier
- From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Commissaire of AUX VILLES DU CENTRE
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of ECONOMATS DU CENTRE
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of Amisol (Manufacture d'Amiante et d'Isolants)