Person ? Ch. de Cambray
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Administrateur of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque
- From 1945-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of BANQUE DE LA GUYANE
- From 1948-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque