Person ? lord Harlech
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Administrateur of UNION CORPORATION, LIMITED (Anciennement A. GOERZ AND COMPANY, LIMITED)
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of UNION CORPORATION, LIMITED (Anciennement A. GOERZ AND COMPANY, LIMITED)