Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
M. Degouy
M. Degouy
From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31,
Administrateur
of
SOCIETE ARTESIENNE DE FORCE ET LUMIERE
From 1948-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Administrateur
of
CH. MILDE FILS ET Cie
Report an issue on this page