Person ? H. Banquet
- From 1945-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of Etablissements Léon Dubois
- From 1945-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of COMPAGNIE FRANÇAISE DES CULTURES D'EXTRÊME-ORIENT
- From 1945-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE DES BISCUITS OLIBET
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of ETABLISSEMENTS VAUGEOIS ET BINOT ET G. CORPET
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of ETABLISSEMENTS PHILIPPE ET CANAUD