Person ? sir Charles Hambro
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Président of UNION CORPORATION, LIMITED (Anciennement A. GOERZ AND COMPANY, LIMITED)
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of UNION CORPORATION, LIMITED (Anciennement A. GOERZ AND COMPANY, LIMITED)