Person ? M. Stein
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE NATIONALE DE LA VISCOSE
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of GIVET-IZIEUX (En Liquidation)
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of Sté DES ANCIENNES SALINES DOMANIALES DE L'EST
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of LA CELLOPHANE
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of CONSTRUCTIONS MECANIQUES DE STAINS
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of GIVET-IZIEUX