Person ? Louis Petit
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE DES LAMPES FOTOS
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE DES ETABLISSEMENTS INDUSTRIELS DE E. C. GRAMMONT ET DE ALEXANDRE GRAMMONT
- From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE DES ETABLISSEMENTS INDUSTRIELS DE E. C. GRAMMONT ET DE ALEXANDRE GRAMMONT
- From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIÉTÉ DES TELEPHONES GRAMMONT
- From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE DES LAMPES FOTOS