Person ? Henri de Wendel
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE DES MINES D'ÉTAIN DU HAUT-TONKIN
- From 1948-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of COMMISSION DES ARDOISIERES D'ANGERS
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of COMPAGNIE ELECTRO-MECANIQUE