Person ? Lucas
- From 1883-01-01 to 1883-12-31, Liquidateur of Le Triton, Compagnie d'assurances maritimes
- From 1903-01-01 to 1903-12-31, Administrateur of Société de l'Union des gaz
- From 1912-01-01 to 1912-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE DES BISCUITS OLIBET
- From 1923-01-01 to 1923-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE DES BISCUITS OLIBET
- From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE DES BISCUITS OLIBET
- From 1927-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of LA BROSSE (Etablissements P. Massé et Dehamme-Delettre, Thomas frères et A. Batardy réunis)
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE DES BISCUITS OLIBET