Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
Balas
Balas
From 1893-01-01 to 1898-12-31,
Administrateur
of
Sté DES HOUILLÈRES DE MONTRAMBERT ET DE LA BERAUDIÈRE
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Administrateur
of
SOCIETE DES MINES D'ÉTAIN DU HAUT-TONKIN
Report an issue on this page