Person
?
Rocherand
-
From 1898-01-01 to 1898-12-31,
Conseiller de surveillance of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque
-
From 1903-01-01 to 1903-12-31,
Administrateur of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque
-
From 1908-01-01 to 1908-12-31,
Administrateur of Banque du Nord
-
From 1908-01-01 to 1908-12-31,
Administrateur of Usines de Briansk
-
From 1908-01-01 to 1908-12-31,
Membre du conseil de surveillance of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque
-
From 1912-01-01 to 1912-12-31,
Membre de Comité de Direction of Usines de Briansk
-
From 1912-01-01 to 1917-12-31,
Membre du Comité de surveillance of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque
-
From 1917-01-01 to 1917-12-31,
Administrateur of Usines de Briansk
-
From 1923-01-01 to 1923-12-31,
Membre de Comité de Direction of Usines de Briansk
-
From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31,
Administrateur of Usines de Briansk