Person ? Join Lambert
- From 1912-01-01 to 1917-12-31, Administrateur of LA MÉTROPOLE COMPAGNIE D'ASSURANCES CONTRE L'INCENDIE
- From 1923-01-01 to 1923-12-31, Administrateur of LA MÉTROPOLE COMPAGNIE D'ASSURANCES CONTRE L'INCENDIE
- From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of LA MÉTROPOLE COMPAGNIE D'ASSURANCES CONTRE L'INCENDIE
- From 1940-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of SOCIÉTÉ FERMIÈRE DES MINES DE SIDI-BOU-AOUANE
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of AGENCES MARITIMES HENRY LESAGE