Person
?
Leopold Albu
-
From 1912-01-01 to 1912-12-31,
Administrateur of GENERAL MINING AND FINANCE CORPORATION
-
From 1912-01-01 to 1917-12-31,
Administrateur of NEW STEYN ESTATE GOLD MINES, LIMITED
-
From 1912-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of VAN RYN GOLD MINES ESTATE, LIMITED
-
From 1917-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of MEYER AND CHARLTON GOLD MINING C° LTD
-
From 1923-01-01 to 1923-12-31,
Administrateur of GENERAL MINING AND FINANCE CORPORATION
-
From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31,
Administrateur of GENERAL MINING AND FINANCE CORPORATION
-
From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31,
Administrateur of NEW STEYN ESTATE GOLD MINES, LIMITED
-
From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31,
Administrateur of WEST RAND CONSOLIDATED MINES LD
-
From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31,
administrateur à Londres of WEST RAND CONSOLIDATED MINES LD
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of GENERAL MINING AND FINANCE CORPORATION
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Membre du comité de Londres of WEST RAND CONSOLIDATED MINES LD
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of NEW STEYN ESTATE GOLD MINES, LIMITED