Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
J. Webster
J. Webster
From 1912-01-01 to 1912-12-31,
Administrateur
of
Indre (Kaolins et Produits céramiques de l’)
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur
of
COMPAGNIE NOUVELLE DES MINES DE VILLEMAGNE
Report an issue on this page