Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
J. Weil
J. Weil
From 1917-01-01 to 1917-12-31,
Gérant
of
« AU CRÉDIT COMMERCIAL » Jules Weil et Cie
From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31,
Gérant
of
« AU CRÉDIT COMMERCIAL » Jules Weil et Cie
Report an issue on this page