Person ? Dupont-Gérin
- From 1917-01-01 to 1917-12-31, Membre du Comité de surveillance of Caisse Lécuyer et Ce
- From 1923-01-01 to 1923-12-31, Administrateur of Caisse Lécuyer et Ce
- From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of Caisse Lécuyer et Ce