Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
A. Cambier
A. Cambier
From 1917-01-01 to 1917-12-31,
Membre du Comité de surveillance
of
Caisse Lécuyer et Ce
From 1923-01-01 to 1923-12-31,
Administrateur
of
Caisse Lécuyer et Ce
From 1927-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur
of
Caisse Lécuyer et Ce
Report an issue on this page