Person ? Henri Hoffet
- From 1917-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of COMPAGNIE DE COMMERCE ET DE NAVIGATION D'EXTREME-ORIENT
- From 1927-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of PLANTATIONS D'AN-LOC
- From 1927-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIÉTÉ DU DOMAINE DE KÉBAO
- From 1940-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIÉTÉ INDOCHINOISE DE PLANTATIONS D'HEVÉAS
- From 1945-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of COMPAGNIE DE COMMERCE ET DE NAVIGATION D'EXTREME-ORIENT