Person ? A. Poutiloff
- From 1908-01-01 to 1908-12-31, Administrateur of Banque Russo-Chinoise
- From 1908-01-01 to 1912-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE DU NAPHTE DE BAKOU
- From 1912-01-01 to 1917-12-31, Membre de Comité de Direction of BANQUE RUSSO-ASIATIQUE
- From 1917-01-01 to 1917-12-31, Administrateur of LENA GOLDFIELDS LTD
- From 1917-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of THE RUSSIAN GENERAL OIL CORPORATION
- From 1917-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIÉTÉ POUR LA CONSTRUCTION DE WAGONS A PÉTROGRAD
- From 1917-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of Société de Production de Naphte G. M. Lianosoff
- From 1923-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE DU NAPHTE DE BAKOU
- From 1923-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of BANQUE RUSSO-ASIATIQUE