Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
Georges Debray
Georges Debray
From 1917-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur
of
SOCIETE DES ÉTABLISSEMENTS DEBRAY
From 1940-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Président
of
SOCIETE DES ÉTABLISSEMENTS DEBRAY
Report an issue on this page