Person ? Raoul Fournier
- From 1917-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of Société anonyme des Mines de Malfidano
- From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of ELECTRICITE DE BEYROUTH (Anciennement Tramways et Eclairage de Beyrouth)
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Administrateur of GRANDS MOULINS DE BORDEAUX
- From 1940-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE FRANÇAISE DES MAGASINS "UNIPRIX"
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of GRANDS MOULINS DE BORDEAUX