Person ? D. C. Jackling
- From 1917-01-01 to 1917-12-31, Administrateur of BUTTE AND SUPERIOR MINING COMPANY
- From 1917-01-01 to 1923-12-31, Administrateur of Chino Copper
- From 1923-01-01 to 1923-12-31, Administrateur of BUTTE AND SUPERIOR MINING COMPANY
- From 1923-01-01 to 1923-12-31, Administrateur of Utah Copper
- From 1923-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of Ray Consolidat. Copper
- From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of Utah Copper
- From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of BUTTE AND SUPERIOR MINING COMPANY
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of BUTTE AND SUPERIOR MINING COMPANY
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Président of BUTTE AND SUPERIOR MINING COMPANY