Person
?
W. A. Mackenzie
-
From 1923-01-01 to 1923-12-31,
Administrateur of SIMMER AND JACK PROPRIETARY MINES LTD
-
From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31,
Administrateur of ROBINSON DEEP, LTD
-
From 1927-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of SIMMER AND JACK MINES LIMITED
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of SUB NIGEL, LIMITED
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED MAIN REEF MINES AND ESTATE, LIMITED
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of ROBINSON DEEP, LTD
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED MAIN REEF MINES AND ESTATE, LIMITED
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1945-12-31,
Président of ROBINSON DEEP, LTD
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1945-12-31,
Président of SIMMER AND JACK MINES LIMITED
-
From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31,
Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd