Person ? B. Reichenbach
- From 1923-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of STÉ GÉNÉRALE DES CHAUSSURES FRANÇAISES
- From 1927-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE PARISIENNE DE MODES
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE PARISIENNE DE MODES
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE PARISIENNE DE MODES
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE PARISIENNE DE MODES
- From 1948-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE PARISIENNE DE MODES