Person ? P. Mangin
- From 1923-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIÉTÉ DES CARBURATEURS ET APPAREILS CLAUDEL
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of HOUILLERES DE RONCHAMP
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Administrateur of HOUILLERES DE RONCHAMP