Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
A. Grammont
A. Grammont
From 1923-01-01 to 1923-12-31,
Administrateur
of
SOCIETE DES ETABLISSEMENTS INDUSTRIELS DE E. C. GRAMMONT ET DE ALEXANDRE GRAMMONT
From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Administrateur
of
MANUFACTURE LYONNAISE DE FILES D'OR ET D'ARGENT
Report an issue on this page