Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
L. Quétron
L. Quétron
From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31,
Conseiller de surveillance
of
GRANOUX
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Membre du conseil de surveillance
of
GRANOUX
Report an issue on this page