Person ? H. C. Porter
- From 1923-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd
- From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of South African Gold Trust, Ld
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of CAMP BIRD LIMITED
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Président of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd