Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
J. Blériot
J. Blériot
From 1927-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur
of
LA BROSSE (Etablissements P. Massé et Dehamme-Delettre, Thomas frères et A. Batardy réunis)
From 1940-01-01 to 1945-12-31,
Administrateur
of
LA BROSSE ET J. DUPONT REUNIS
Report an issue on this page