Person ? Roger Girche
- From 1927-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of TEXTILOSES ET TEXTILES
- From 1929-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of COMPAGNIE EQUATORIALE DE MINES
- From 1931-01-01 to 1931-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE D'ELECTRO METALLURGIE DE DIVES
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Administrateur Directeur of TEXTILOSES ET TEXTILES
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur General of TEXTILOSES ET TEXTILES