Person ? Schaeffer
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of COROCORO UNITED COPPER MINES LIMITED
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE FRANÇAISE DES NOUVELLES HEBRIDES
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of Manufacture De Vilebrequins de Lorette (MAVILOR)