Person ? J. A. Agnew
- From 1917-01-01 to 1917-12-31, Administrateur of CAMP BIRD LIMITED
- From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE ANONYME DES MINES DES BORMETTES
- From 1927-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of CAMP BIRD LIMITED