Person ? G. Bexon
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIÉTÉ IMMOBILIÈRE DE L'AIR LIQUIDE (Immeuble quai d'Orsay, rue Cognac)
- From 1940-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIÉTÉ IMMOBILIÈRE DE L'AIR LIQUIDE (Immeuble quai d'Orsay, rue Cognac)
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of LA SOUDURE AUTOGENE FRANÇAISE
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIÉTÉ IMMOBILIÈRE DE L'AIR LIQUIDE (Immeuble quai d'Orsay, rue Cognac)
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of Produits Péroxydés