Person ? Union Houillère et Electrique
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of HOUILLERES DE RONCHAMP
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of FORCES MOTRICES DE SAINT-HIPPOLYTE
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Administrateur of COMPAGNIE DES LAMPES
- From 1940-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Administrateur of HOUILLERES DE RONCHAMP
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Administrateur of COMPAGNIE D'ÉLECTRICITÉ LOIRE ET NIÈVRE