Person ? Paul Blanchard
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of PLANTATIONS DES TERRES ROUGES
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of COMPAGNIE FONCIERE D'INDOCHINE
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of COMPAGNIE DES CAOUTCHOUCS DE PADANG
- From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of ETABLISSEMENTS SULITZER FRÈRES
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of ETABLISSEMENTS SULITZER FRÈRES