Person ? Th.-F. Winmill
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of BRITISH-AMERICAN TOBACCO Cy Ltd
- From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of BRITISH-AMERICAN TOBACCO Cy Ltd
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Président of BRITISH-AMERICAN TOBACCO Cy Ltd