Person ? L. Pierre
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIÉTÉ DES BRASSERIES DU MAROC
- From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIÉTÉ DES BRASSERIES DU MAROC
- From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of BRASSERIES ET GLACIERES DE L'INDOCHINE
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Administrateur of BRASSERIES DE L'OUEST AFRICAIN