Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
R. Jaugey
R. Jaugey
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Administrateur
of
Sté GRAND COMBIENNE D'ECLAIRAGE ET D'ENERGIE
From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31,
Secrétaire
of
Sté GRAND COMBIENNE D'ECLAIRAGE ET D'ENERGIE
Report an issue on this page