Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
J. Lepercq
J. Lepercq
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Administrateur
of
SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE GERLAND
From 1948-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Administrateur
of
GRAND BAZAR DE LYON
From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Administrateur
of
SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE GERLAND
Report an issue on this page