Data for Financial History
Stock Exchanges
Issuers
Persons
(current)
Use DFIH Data
About
Publications
Team
Wiki
Sign in
Person
?
G. Eymard
G. Eymard
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Vice-Président
of
MINIERE DU SUD-OUEST DE LA FRANCE
From 1945-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Administrateur
of
MINIERE DU SUD-OUEST DE LA FRANCE
Report an issue on this page