Person
?
W. H. A. Lawrence
-
From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31,
Administrateur of TRANSVAAL CONSOLIDATED LAND AND EXPLORATION COMPANY, LIMITED
-
From 1927-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of CROWN MINES, LIMITED
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of EAST RAND PROPRIETARY MINES, LIMITED
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED MAIN REEF MINES AND ESTATE, LIMITED
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of Durban Roodepoort Deep, Ld
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of MODDERFONTEIN B. GOLD MINES LTD
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of Rose Deep, Ld
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of VILLAGE DEEP, LIMITED
-
From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31,
Administrateur of GELDENHUIS DEEP
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Administrateur of CROWN MINES, LIMITED
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED MAIN REEF MINES AND ESTATE, LIMITED
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Administrateur of MODDERFONTEIN B. GOLD MINES LTD
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Président of Durban Roodepoort Deep, Ld
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Administrateur of TRANSVAAL CONSOLIDATED LAND AND EXPLORATION COMPANY, LIMITED
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Administrateur of Rose Deep, Ld
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31,
Administrateur of GELDENHUIS DEEP
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Vice-Président of Rand Mines, ld
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Président of EAST RAND PROPRIETARY MINES, LIMITED
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Administrateur of CITY DEEP LIMITED
-
From 1940-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Administrateur of GENERAL MINING AND FINANCE CORPORATION
-
From 1943-01-01 to 1950-12-31,
Directeur of THE CENTRAL MINING AND INVESTMENT CORPORATION LTD
-
From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31,
Administrateur of MODDERFONTEIN B. GOLD MINES LTD
-
From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31,
sous-censseur of THE CENTRAL MINING AND INVESTMENT CORPORATION LTD
-
From 1945-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED MAIN REEF MINES AND ESTATE, LIMITED
-
From 1945-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Administrateur of GELDENHUIS DEEP
-
From 1945-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Président of Durban Roodepoort Deep, Ld
-
From 1945-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Administrateur of CROWN MINES, LIMITED
-
From 1945-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Administrateur of Rose Deep, Ld
-
From 1945-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Administrateur of TRANSVAAL CONSOLIDATED LAND AND EXPLORATION COMPANY, LIMITED
-
From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31,
Administrateur of MODDERFONTEIN B. GOLD MINES LTD
-
From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Président of CROWN MINES, LIMITED
-
From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Président of Rand Mines, ld
-
From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Administrateur of WEST DRIEFONTEIN GOLD MINES C° LTD
-
From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31,
Administrateur of EAST RAND PROPRIETARY MINES, LIMITED
-
From 1953-01-01 to 1955-12-31,
Administrateur of THE CENTRAL MINING AND INVESTMENT CORPORATION LTD