Person ? Charles Weber
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Suppléant of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Commissaire des comptes of Société Générale Alsacienne de Banque