Person ? J. Ehrensperger
- From 1933-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of HOUILLERES DE RONCHAMP
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Administrateur of HOUILLERES DE RONCHAMP
- From 1940-01-01 to 1940-12-31, Administrateur of L'HYDRO-ENERGIE
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Administrateur of L'HYDRO-ENERGIE
- From 1945-01-01 to 1945-12-31, Administrateur of HOUILLERES DE RONCHAMP