Person ? Charles Dumas
- From 1940-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIÉTÉ DE L'OUENZA
- From 1948-01-01 to 1948-12-31, Representant of Charbonnages Nord-Africains
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Administrateur of SOCIETE ANONYME MAROCAINE DU DJEBEL CHICKER