Person ? Georges Cahen
- From 1912-01-01 to 1912-12-31, Administrateur of Canadian American Coal and Coke C° Ltd
- From 1912-01-01 to 1923-12-31, Administrateur of MINES DE FER DE FILLOLS
- From 1912-01-01 to 1923-12-31, Administrateur of THE BECHUANALAND EXPLORATION C° LTD
- From 1923-01-01 to 1923-12-31, Administrateur of COMPAGNIE GÉNÉRALE DES BOIS COLONIAUX
- From 1923-01-01 to 1933-12-31, Administrateur of Compagnie électrique du Secteur de la Rive gauche de Paris
- From 1953-01-01 to 1953-12-31, Président of ANCIENS ETABLISSEMENTS BRAUNSTEIN FRERES