Person ? H. -L. Sapte
- From 1912-01-01 to 1912-12-31, Administrateur of SIMMER AND JACK PROPRIETARY MINES LTD
- From 1912-01-01 to 1917-12-31, Administrateur of GOLD MINES INVESTMENT COMPANY LIMITED
- From 1912-01-01 to 1923-12-31, Administrateur of CONSOLIDATED GOLDFIELDS OF SOUTH AFRICA Ltd