Person ? C. J. Palmer
- From 1912-01-01 to 1912-12-31, Administrateur of Spies Petroleum Co, Ld
- From 1912-01-01 to 1912-12-31, Administrateur of THE MAIKOP SPIES COMPANY, LIMITED
- From 1917-01-01 to 1917-12-31, Administrateur of THE MAIKOP SPIES COMPANY, LIMITED
- From 1923-01-01 to 1923-12-31, Administrateur of Spies Petroleum Co, Ld
- From 1927-01-01 to 1927-12-31, Administrateur of Spies Petroleum Co, Ld